TX SB1973 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the operation of and coverage by a nonprofit agricultural organization.
Title
Relating to the operation of and coverage by a nonprofit agricultural organization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |