TX HB3559 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allocation of loans made under the owner-builder loan program.
Title
Relating to allocation of loans made under the owner-builder loan program.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-04 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-04 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-20 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2011-03-22 | Read first time | |
2011-03-11 | Filed |
Subjects
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Housing--Rural
LOANS
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Finance
Housing--General
Housing--Rural
LOANS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB3559 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB03559I.htm |