TX HB3539 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation by a developer of the installation of solar energy devices in a residential subdivision.
Title
Relating to the regulation by a developer of the installation of solar energy devices in a residential subdivision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-12 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-28 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2015-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Energy
Energy--Solar
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property
Energy--Solar
Property Interests
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Real Property