TX HB3351 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to standards required for certain rankings of physicians by health benefit plan issuers.
Title
Relating to standards required for certain rankings of physicians by health benefit plan issuers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 103 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1358 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | House | Filed |