TX HB3283 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to administrative penalties assessed or imposed against certain hospitals and reported to certain health professional licensing boards.
Title
Relating to administrative penalties assessed or imposed against certain hospitals and reported to certain health professional licensing boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF