TX HB3177 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of continuous sexual abuse of a child or disabled individual; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of continuous sexual abuse of a child or disabled individual; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-11 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Disabilities, Persons with
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ABUSE
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Disabilities, Persons with
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
SEXUAL ABUSE