TX HB2777 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an application for the amendment of a certificate of public convenience and necessity in an area within the boundaries of a political subdivision.
Title
Relating to an application for the amendment of a certificate of public convenience and necessity in an area within the boundaries of a political subdivision.
Sponsors
Rep. Dade Phelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer