TX HB2713 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the removal, relocation, alteration, or construction of certain monuments, memorials, or designations located on public property; authorizing a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to the removal, relocation, alteration, or construction of certain monuments, memorials, or designations located on public property; authorizing a civil penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-03-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ALAMO, THE
Historic Preservation & Museums
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
Military & Veterans
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
State Officers
Historic Preservation & Museums
HISTORICAL COMMISSION, TEXAS
Military & Veterans
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CAPITOL BUILDING & GROUNDS
State Officers