TX HB2209 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to improving training and staff development for primary and secondary educators to enable them to more effectively serve all students.
Title
Relating to improving training and staff development for primary and secondary educators to enable them to more effectively serve all students.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2017-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Educator Quality by chair |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING