TX HB1882 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of and contributions to and benefits from the systems and programs administered by the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of and contributions to and benefits from the systems and programs administered by the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. William Callegari [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] | Rep. Debbie Riddle [R] |
Rep. Ralph Sheffield [R] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-09 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2013-05-09 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-09 | House | Amended |
2013-05-09 | House | Point of order overruled |
2013-05-09 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-09 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-09 | House | Point of order withdrawn |
2013-05-09 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Pensions |
2013-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-26 | House | Filed |