TX HB1766 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-06 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to involuntary termination of parental rights based on sexual assault of the child's other parent and the child support obligations of the parent whose rights were terminated.
Title
Relating to involuntary termination of parental rights based on sexual assault of the child's other parent and the child support obligations of the parent whose rights were terminated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-06 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-06 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-05 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2017-03-14 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Family
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child
PARENTAL RIGHTS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Family
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child
PARENTAL RIGHTS
SEXUAL ASSAULT