TX HB1736 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the penalty for illegally passing stationary authorized emergency vehicles.
Title
Relating to the penalty for illegally passing stationary authorized emergency vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-03 | Read first time | |
2011-02-23 | Filed |