TX HB1619 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-26 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to emergency service districts.
Title
Relating to emergency service districts.
Sponsors
Rep. John Garza [R] | Rep. Tim Kleinschmidt [R] | Rep. Rob Orr [R] | Sen. Dan Patrick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-25 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-25 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-24 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-24 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-24 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-24 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-24 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-24 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-23 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-23 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-17 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-19 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-19 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2011-03-10 | Read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
EMERGENCY SERVICES COMMISSIONERS, BOARD OF
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
RURAL AFFAIRS, DEPARTMENT OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
County Government--Finance
County Government--General
EMERGENCY SERVICES COMMISSIONERS, BOARD OF
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
RURAL AFFAIRS, DEPARTMENT OF
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous