TX HB1607 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity for certain transmission projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity for certain transmission projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#603 (Y: 106 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#568 (Y: 37 N: 107 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#567 (Y: 31 N: 112 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#566 (Y: 36 N: 104 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-30HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-30HouseRecord vote RV#603
2021-04-30HousePassed
2021-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-29HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#568
2021-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 5-Tinderholt
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#567
2021-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 4-Tinderholt
2021-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-Tinderholt
2021-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Tinderholt
2021-04-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-29HouseRecord vote RV#566
2021-04-29HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Patterson
2021-04-29HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 3
2021-04-29HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Patterson
2021-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-29HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-09HouseRead first time
2021-02-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1325 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1607
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01607I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01607H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01607E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01607H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01607H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01607H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01607H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01607H25.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01607I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01607H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01607H.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1607&RcdVtNo=566&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1607&RcdVtNo=567&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1607&RcdVtNo=568&Ch=H&Dt=04/29/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1607&RcdVtNo=603&Ch=H&Dt=04/30/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback