TX SB1325 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity for certain transmission projects.
Title
Relating to certificates of public convenience and necessity for certain transmission projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1607 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Received from the House
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1325 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01325I.htm |