TX HB1560 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-27 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-27 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the enterprise zone program.
Title
Relating to the enterprise zone program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-27 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-27 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-27 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Passed | |
2011-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-25 | Record vote | |
2011-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-25 | Amended | |
2011-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-25 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-08 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-08 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-31 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-30 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-29 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | |
2011-03-03 | Read first time | |
2011-02-21 | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Enterprise Zones
Business & Commerce--General
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Business & Commerce--Enterprise Zones
Business & Commerce--General
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General