TX HB1524 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-20 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-20 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Case Creek Municipal Utility District No. 1 of Grayson County; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Case Creek Municipal Utility District No. 1 of Grayson County; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-08 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-24 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-23 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-15 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-04 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-03-02 | Read first time | |
2011-02-18 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2011-02-18 | Filed |
Subjects
CASE CREEK MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1 OF GRAYSON COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1524 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01524I.htm |