TX HB1438 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to service of process on certain domestic and foreign entities for the collection of delinquent property taxes.
Title
Relating to service of process on certain domestic and foreign entities for the collection of delinquent property taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Tryon Lewis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-04-07 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-23 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-21 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-16 | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Business & Commerce--General
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1438 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01438I.htm |