TX HB1261 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-28 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-28 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to court costs imposed on conviction and deposited to the municipal court technology fund.
Title
Relating to court costs imposed on conviction and deposited to the municipal court technology fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-28 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-11 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-10 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
City Government--General
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--Municipal
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
City Government--Finance
City Government--General
Courts
Courts--Administration
Courts--Municipal
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1261 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01261I.htm |