TX HB1068 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study by the Legislative Budget Board of the feasibility of preparing an impact statement regarding the effects of certain proposed legislation on a political subdivision.
Title
Relating to a study by the Legislative Budget Board of the feasibility of preparing an impact statement regarding the effects of certain proposed legislation on a political subdivision.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Legislature
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Legislature
Political Subdivisions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB1068 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB01068I.htm |