TN SJR0844 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Adjourns 109th General Assembly sine die at close of business on April 22, 2016.
Title
Adjourns 109th General Assembly sine die at close of business on April 22, 2016.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-22 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SJR0844&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SJR0844.pdf |