TN SB3817 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-29 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, restructures Lake County highway commission by increasing the number of highway commission districts from two to three, to be coextensive with the county commission districts. - Amends Chapter 262 of the Private Acts of 1980, as amended.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, restructures Lake County highway commission by increasing the number of highway commission districts from two to three, to be coextensive with the county commission districts. - Amends Chapter 262 of the Private Acts of 1980, as amended.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 76 | |
2012-04-30 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 4/30/2012 | |
2012-04-30 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2012-04-23 | P2C held on desk. Local Bill | |
2012-04-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-04-18 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3886 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-29 - Pr. Ch. 76