TN SB2900 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the index of appropriations from state tax revenues for 2022-2023 fiscal year to exceed the index of estimated growth in the state's economy by $110,200,000 or 0.5 percent.
Title
AN ACT pursuant to Article II, Section 24, of the Tennessee Constitution providing for the dollar amount and rate by which the growth of appropriations from state tax revenues will exceed the estimated growth in the state's economy and to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 52.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2885 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Held on desk.