TN HB2885 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the index of appropriations from state tax revenues for 2022-2023 fiscal year to exceed the index of estimated growth in the state's economy by $110,200,000 or 0.5 percent.
Title
AN ACT pursuant to Article II, Section 24, of the Tennessee Constitution providing for the dollar amount and rate by which the growth of appropriations from state tax revenues will exceed the estimated growth in the state's economy and to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 52.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Held on desk. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Appropriations Calendar for 4/21/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-07 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2900 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee