TN SB2885 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1072
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1072
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes Cumberland County to establish a railroad authority of three or five members and prescribes the manner in which members are appointed. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 56, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 56, Part 2, relative to rail service.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1072 | |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/14/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Trans & Safety Comm. 3-9-22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
Same As/Similar To
HB2664 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2022