TN SB2705 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1025
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Sienna's Law," which establishes requirements for the disposition of children adjudicated delinquent for certain offenses. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, enacts "Sienna's Law," which establishes requirements for the disposition of children adjudicated delinquent for certain offenses. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1025 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-25 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 75, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Lamberth, Goins, Alexander, Akbari) |
2018-04-23 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Bowling, Kelsey, Harris) |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from its non-concurrence. (Amendment 1 - HA1077) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 SB2705 |
2018-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in amendment (Amendment 1 - HA1077) |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1077) |
2018-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2691 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1025