TN SB2636 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Pub. Ch. 989
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Pub. Ch. 989
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes, in any county in which the judicial commissioner is selected by the general sessions judge or judges, the county legislative body of such county to elect, by a two-thirds majority, to allow each judicial commissioner to receive 12 hours of appropriate continuing education each calendar year under the supervision of the appointing general sessions judge or judges rather than the Judicial Commissioners Association of Tennessee or the Tennessee Court Clerks Association; requires that judicial commissioners in Knox County be known as magistrates.
Title
As enacted, authorizes, in any county in which the judicial commissioner is selected by the general sessions judge or judges, the county legislative body of such county to elect, by a two-thirds majority, to allow each judicial commissioner to receive 12 hours of appropriate continuing education each calendar year under the supervision of the appointing general sessions judge or judges rather than the Judicial Commissioners Association of Tennessee or the Tennessee Court Clerks Association; requires that judicial commissioners in Knox County be known as magistrates.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-30 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Pub. Ch. 989 | |
2010-06-07 | Effective date(s) 06/02/10 | |
2010-06-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-01 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-01 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-05-27 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-05-26 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-05-24 | S. concurred in H. am. 2 | |
2010-05-24 | S. concurred in H. am. 1 | |
2010-05-24 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (2) cal. for 05/24/2010 | |
2010-05-20 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-05-17 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/20/10 | |
2010-05-17 | Reset on Next Available Reg cal. | |
2010-05-13 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/17/10 | |
2010-05-13 | Reset on Reg cal. for 5/17/10 | |
2010-05-13 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1112) | |
2010-05-13 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1469) | |
2010-05-13 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-04-07 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-04-05 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-04-05 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-04-05 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1082) | |
2010-04-05 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/05/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 00 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 02/09/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-20 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2671 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 989