TN SB2623 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, on or before January 1, 2025, the commissioner of economic and community development, in consultation with the commissioner of revenue, to report to the finance, ways and means committees of the house of representatives and the senate on the economic development impact of the Border Region Retail Tourism Development District Act on the regions of the state where certified border region retail tourism development districts are located. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7 and Title 67, relative to economic development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2835 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.