TN SB2547 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the TACIR report on the "Competitive Wireless Broadband Investment, Deployment, and Safety Act of 2018" due January 1, 2021, to legislative committees also be made available on TACIR's website by January 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 13; Title 65; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires that the TACIR report on the "Competitive Wireless Broadband Investment, Deployment, and Safety Act of 2018" due January 1, 2021, to legislative committees also be made available on TACIR's website by January 1, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 13; Title 65; Title 66 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2664 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.