TN SB2522 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date(s) 06/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the pay schedule in Tennessee Code Annotated for assistant district attorneys and assistant district public defenders. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 8, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 8, Chapter 7, relative to the compensation of certain public employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Effective date(s) 06/01/2022 | |
2022-06-03 | Pub. Ch. 1122 | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA1002) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0930) |
2022-04-27 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1002) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0597) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2762 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1122