TN SB2460 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that a clerk of the court must offer a payment plan after one year from the date of the completion of the sentence when a person has not paid all litigation taxes, court costs, and fines assessed as a result of the disposition of any offense under criminal laws. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 24.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that a clerk of the court must offer a payment plan after one year from the date of the completion of the sentence when a person has not paid all litigation taxes, court costs, and fines assessed as a result of the disposition of any offense under criminal laws. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 24.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2540 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee