TN SB2377 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 848
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 848
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that attorneys' fees be awarded for state and local government employees when such employees are sued in an individual capacity and are the prevailing party. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20.
Title
As enacted, requires that attorneys' fees be awarded for state and local government employees when such employees are sued in an individual capacity and are the prevailing party. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 848 | |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1679 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 848