TN HB1679 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 848
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 848
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that attorneys' fees be awarded for state and local government employees when such employees are sued in an individual capacity and are the prevailing party. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20.
Title
As enacted, requires that attorneys' fees be awarded for state and local government employees when such employees are sued in an individual capacity and are the prevailing party. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Yarbro (Y: 9 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 48 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Yarbro (Y: 9 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 48 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 848 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 06/01/2016 | |
2016-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-04-06 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 80, Nays 15 PNV 0 HB1679 |
2016-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/6/2016 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 20, Nays 9, PNV 1 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Failed to adopt, Ayes 9, Nays 18 (Amendment 2 - SA0864) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0789) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 16, PNV 2 |
2016-03-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0615) |
2016-02-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/25/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2377 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 848