TN SB2351 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various revisions to the ASD, including requiring schools assigned to the ASD on or after July 1, 2016, be in the bottom 2.5 percent of schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, makes various revisions to the ASD, including requiring schools assigned to the ASD on or after July 1, 2016, be in the bottom 2.5 percent of schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 3 and Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2200 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-15 - Def. to Summer Study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2351&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB2351.pdf |