TN SB2351 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/3/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/3/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires increases in property tax rates higher than $1.00 per $100 of the assessed value of property by a county or municipality to be approved through a referendum; authorizes the referendum process. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires increases in property tax rates higher than $1.00 per $100 of the assessed value of property by a county or municipality to be approved through a referendum; authorizes the referendum process. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-01-18 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2919 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-14 - Failed for Lack of Motion in: S&LG Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2351&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB2351.pdf |