TN SB2315 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 550
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 550
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Employment Security Law, including provisions governing amount of benefit to be paid and base period. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7 and Title 62, Chapter 43.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Employment Security Law, including provisions governing amount of benefit to be paid and base period. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 7 and Title 62, Chapter 43.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-20 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-07 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 550 | |
2009-06-02 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0595) | |
2009-06-02 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0252) | |
2009-06-02 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-28 | S. Reset on Cal. for 6/2/2009 | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/28/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 2 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/19/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2324 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-07 - Pub. Ch. 550