TN SB2308 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands Rule 412 of the Rules of Evidence, known as the rape shield law, to include the offenses of sex trafficking or commercial sexual exploitation of children, aggravated rape of a child, statutory rape by an authority figure, and promoting travel for prostitution. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, expands Rule 412 of the Rules of Evidence, known as the rape shield law, to include the offenses of sex trafficking or commercial sexual exploitation of children, aggravated rape of a child, statutory rape by an authority figure, and promoting travel for prostitution. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2615 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee