TN HB2615 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands Rule 412 of the Rules of Evidence, known as the rape shield law, to include the offenses of sex trafficking or commercial sexual exploitation of children, aggravated rape of a child, statutory rape by an authority figure, and promoting travel for prostitution. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, expands Rule 412 of the Rules of Evidence, known as the rape shield law, to include the offenses of sex trafficking or commercial sexual exploitation of children, aggravated rape of a child, statutory rape by an authority figure, and promoting travel for prostitution. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2308 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee