TN SB2174 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 30 days to 30 business days, the amount of time a municipal or county official has to forward a copy of the form signed by a building permit applicant to the county official or employee who has been designated by the county legislative body to collect the tax when a building permit is issued under the County Powers Relief Act. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 29, relative to the County Powers Relief Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2250 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.