TN HB2250 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 30 days to 30 business days, the amount of time a municipal or county official has to forward a copy of the form signed by a building permit applicant to the county official or employee who has been designated by the county legislative body to collect the tax when a building permit is issued under the County Powers Relief Act. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 29, relative to the County Powers Relief Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2174 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee