TN SB2138 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a veteran who has served at least two years active duty as a military police officer to attend the POST transition school offered by the Tennessee Law Enforcement Training Academy. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8.
Title
As introduced, allows a veteran who has served at least two years active duty as a military police officer to attend the POST transition school offered by the Tennessee Law Enforcement Training Academy. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2197 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee