TN SB2024 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 890
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 890
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing allocation of certain payments in lieu of taxes and the Tennessee central economic authority. - Amends TCA Section 67-9-102.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing allocation of certain payments in lieu of taxes and the Tennessee central economic authority. - Amends TCA Section 67-9-102.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 890 | |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/19/18 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State & Local Government calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2161 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 890