TN SB1999 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - S. Reset on Cal. for 4/30/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-16 - S. Reset on Cal. for 4/30/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires citizenship status to be proven prior to registration to vote and requires certain procedures to ensure identity and citizenship status prior to voting. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 4.
Title
As introduced, requires citizenship status to be proven prior to registration to vote and requires certain procedures to ensure identity and citizenship status prior to voting. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-08 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-16 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/30/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/16/2009 | |
2009-04-13 | S. Reset on cal. for 04/16/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/13/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/7/2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-17 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 3/24/2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/17/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Action def. in S. S&L Gov. to 3/17/09 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-02-26 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-23 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1838 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-15 - Failed In s/c Elections of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee