TN SB1983 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the period of reduced fees payable to the secretary of state relating to nonprofit charitable gaming and the solicitation of charitable funds. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 17, Part 1 and Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5, relative to certain fees collected by the secretary of state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 867 | |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 5 |
2022-03-28 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/22/2022 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1979 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 867