TN SB1774 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, rewrites requirement that LEAs must integrate minimum of 90 minutes physical activity per week to require LEAs to integrate 30 minutes of physical activity per school day for elementary and secondary school students. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, rewrites requirement that LEAs must integrate minimum of 90 minutes physical activity per week to require LEAs to integrate 30 minutes of physical activity per school day for elementary and secondary school students. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0836 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-03 - Failed In s/c K-12 of ED of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1774&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1774.pdf |