TN SB1751 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty from a Class C misdemeanor to a Class B misdemeanor for removing a wild animal, wild fowl, or fish while trespassing on land; increases various fines under $500 to not more than $500. - Amends TCA Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 70, relative to wildlife resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2141 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee