TN SB1749 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases by 30 days the time period in which a county mayor has to appoint an attorney to bring suit after receiving a report from auditors that sums cannot be collected without suit; increases by 30 days the time period in which the comptroller of the treasury has to appoint an attorney to bring such suits if the county mayor fails or refuses to bring such suits. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, increases by 30 days the time period in which a county mayor has to appoint an attorney to bring suit after receiving a report from auditors that sums cannot be collected without suit; increases by 30 days the time period in which the comptroller of the treasury has to appoint an attorney to bring such suits if the county mayor fails or refuses to bring such suits. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1763 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-26 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1749&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1749.pdf |