TN SB1709 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 465
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 465
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires LEAs to establish a transparent and uniform method of calculating all terms and costs related to any lease, lease-purchase agreement, or other contract or agreement executed between the LEA and a charter school for the use of the LEA's educational facilities; establishes certain requirements regarding underutilized and vacant property; specifies uses of capital outlay funds by charter schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.
Title
As enacted, requires LEAs to establish a transparent and uniform method of calculating all terms and costs related to any lease, lease-purchase agreement, or other contract or agreement executed between the LEA and a charter school for the use of the LEA's educational facilities; establishes certain requirements regarding underutilized and vacant property; specifies uses of capital outlay funds by charter schools. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 465 | |
2011-05-21 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0302) | |
2011-05-21 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0301) | |
2011-05-21 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | S. Reset on cal. for 5/21/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-04-28 | Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1980 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-15 - Pub. Ch. 465