TN SB1674 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Def. to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Def. to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes requirement that the child safety seat for a child age one through three weighing more than 20 pounds be secured in a forward-facing position. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, deletes requirement that the child safety seat for a child age one through three weighing more than 20 pounds be secured in a forward-facing position. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 6.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Def. to Summer Study (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REREFER TO COMMITTEE PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO RECALL FROM SENATE (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO RECALL FROM SENATE (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REREFER TO COMMITTEE PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO RECONSIDER (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO RECALL FROM SENATE (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO RECALL FROM SENATE (Y: 64 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - SENATE TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Def. to Summer Study |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-14 | House | Re-ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2016-03-14 | House | Motion to lift from table adopted. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate returned. |
2016-03-10 | House | Recalled from S. |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 68, Nays 19, PNV 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0667) |
2016-03-07 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0601) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1468 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-14 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.