TN HB1468 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes requirement that the child safety seat for a child age one through three weighing more than 20 pounds be secured in a forward-facing position. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, deletes requirement that the child safety seat for a child age one through three weighing more than 20 pounds be secured in a forward-facing position. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 9, Part 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2016-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-07 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-23 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1674 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-22 - Def. to Summer Study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1468&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1468.pdf |